Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Asztrik Várszegi, O.S.B.

Abbot of Pannonhalma

Titular Bishop of Culusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1946 BornSopron
15 Aug 196519.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jan 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Dec 198842.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
23 Dec 198842.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Culusi
11 Feb 198943.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Culusi
18 Mar 199145.1AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Asztrik Várszegi:
Bishop Imre Asztrik Várszegi O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Abbey of Pannonhalma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013