Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gyula Márfi

Archbishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1943 BornPördefölde
18 Jun 196723.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 199551.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
11 Nov 199551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amantia
2 Dec 199552.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amantia
14 Aug 199753.7AppointedArchbishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyula Márfi:
Archbishop Gyula Márfi (born ) Archbishop of Veszprém

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Veszprém.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,633

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013