Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Konkoly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1930Born
20 Jun 195424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Szombathely, Hungary
5 Jun 198757.2AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
11 Jul 198757.3Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
20 Jun 200676.2RetiredBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
20 Nov 201787.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Konkoly (VIAF: 18425197)
Bishop István Konkoly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerkaszentmiklos
Death PlaceSzombathely, Diocese of Szombathely

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018