Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miklós Beer

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1943 BornBudapest
19 Jun 196623.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 200056.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
8 Apr 200056.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
27 May 200056.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
27 May 200359.9AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Miklós Beer:
Bishop Miklós Beer (born ) Bishop of Vác

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vác.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,773

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015