Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Spányi

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1950 BornBudapest
19 Jul 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
13 Feb 199847.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
13 Feb 199847.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tharros
28 Mar 199847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tharros
4 Apr 200352.4AppointedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Spányi:
Bishop Antal Spányi (born ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Székesfehérvár (Albareale).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013