Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Csaba Ternyák

Archbishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1953 BornFertoszentmiklós, Hungary
21 Jun 197925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
24 Dec 199239.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Dec 199239.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Eminentiana
6 Jan 199339.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Eminentiana
11 Dec 199744.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
15 Mar 200753.3AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
9 Jun 200753.5InstalledArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Csaba Ternyák:
Archbishop Csaba Ternyák (born ) Archbishop of Eger

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Eger.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,947
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013