Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kornél Pataky (Pataki)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1920BornPesterzsébet
30 Apr 194424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
7 Jan 197554.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Győr (Raab), Hungary
7 Jan 197554.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
6 Feb 197554.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi
2 Apr 197656.1AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
18 Mar 199171.0ResignedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
6 Oct 199878.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Kornél Pataky (Pataki):
Bishop Kornél Pataky (Pataki) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013