Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lajos Pápai

Bishop Emeritus of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1940 BornGyőr
21 Jun 196322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
18 Mar 199150.5AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
27 Apr 199150.6Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
17 May 201675.6RetiredBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lajos Pápai
Bishop Lajos Pápai (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Győr (Raab)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Győr (Raab).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,403
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016