Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lajos Varga

Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

Titular Bishop of Sicca Veneria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1950 BornBudapest
23 Jun 197423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
27 May 200655.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
27 May 200655.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
15 Jul 200655.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria

MicroData Summary for Lajos Varga:
Bishop Lajos Varga (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vác.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,208
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013