Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juliusz Janusz

Apostolic Nuncio

Titular Archbishop of Caprulae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1944 Born
19 Mar 196723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 Mar 199551.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caprulae
25 Mar 199551.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
8 May 199551.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caprulae
26 Sep 199854.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique
9 Apr 200359.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
10 Feb 201166.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
10 Feb 201166.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Kosovo
21 Sep 201874.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
21 Sep 201874.5RetiredApostolic Delegate to Kosovo

MicroData Summary for Juliusz Janusz
(VIAF: 164419663; WikiData: Q1345318)
Archbishop Juliusz Janusz (born ) Apostolic Nuncio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyczana, Diocese of Tarnów, Poland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,551
  • r: CB, 7 Sep 2018
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024