Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rrok Gjonlleshaj

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Apostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1961 Born
1 Aug 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Prizren, Serbia
5 Apr 201655.1AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
14 May 201655.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
28 Sep 201958.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Rrok Gjonlleshaj
Archbishop Rrok Gjonlleshaj (born ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelezh
Ordained BishopNëna Tereze, Cathedral, Pristina, Apostolic Administration of Prizren, Serbia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bar (Antivari).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2016
  • op: CB, 6 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,912
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 28 Sep 2019

Quantcast