Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zef Gashi, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1938 BornPešter
29 Jun 196425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jun 199859.5AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
19 Sep 199859.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
5 Apr 201677.3RetiredArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Zef Gashi
Archbishop Zef Gashi S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bar (Antivari).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,426
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016