Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petar Perkolic

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1922Born
18 Mar 194522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
19 Dec 197856.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
18 Mar 197956.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
6 May 197956.7SucceededArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
27 Jun 199875.8RetiredArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
7 Sep 200684.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Petar Perkolic
Archbishop Petar Perkolic (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStari Bar

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Vatican Information Service, 19 Sep 2006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast