Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severin Pernek

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1924BornTravnik
29 Jun 194823.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 196742.4AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
18 Jun 196742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
7 Dec 198965.1ResignedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
2 May 199772.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Severin Pernek:
Bishop Severin Pernek (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013