Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Pichler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1913Born
13 Mar 193723.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 195945.5AppointedBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Oct 195945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
15 May 198975.4RetiredBishop of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
17 May 199278.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Alfred Pichler
Bishop Alfred Pichler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banja Luka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOštrelj

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 88
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast