Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matija Zvekanovic

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Subotica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1913BornSubotica
29 Jun 193724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jugoslavenska Backa, Serbia
13 Nov 195542.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Burca
25 Feb 195643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Burca
195844.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Backa, Serbia
8 Feb 196854.9AppointedBishop of Subotica, Serbia
25 Apr 198976.1RetiredBishop of Subotica, Serbia
24 Apr 199178.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Subotica, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Matija Zvekanovic:
Bishop Matija Zvekanovic (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Subotica

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015