Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Perić

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1926Born
29 Jun 195225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
29 Apr 198154.5AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
26 Jul 198154.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
5 Jun 198356.6DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Marko Perić
Bishop Marko Perić (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBijelo Polje

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast