Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franjo Cardinal Kuharić

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zagreb

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1919BornPribic
15 Jul 194526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
15 Feb 196444.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
15 Feb 196444.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
3 May 196445.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meta
16 Jun 197051.1AppointedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
2 Feb 198363.7Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198363.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
5 Jul 199778.2RetiredArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
11 Mar 200282.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Franjo Kuharić:
Franjo Cardinal Kuharić (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zagreb

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
  • a cardinal for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015