Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vlado Košić

Bishop of Sisak, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1959 Born
30 Jun 198526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
29 Dec 199839.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
29 Dec 199839.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
6 Feb 199939.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
5 Dec 200950.5AppointedBishop of Sisak, Croatia
6 Feb 201050.6InstalledBishop of Sisak, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vlado Košić
Bishop Vlado Košić (born ) Bishop of Sisak

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDru×binec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sisak.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 May 2017