Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Pozaić, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Petina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1945 Born
24 Jun 197327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 200559.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
2 Feb 200559.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Petina
19 Mar 200559.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petina
13 May 201771.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Valentin Pozaić (VIAF: 16385085)
Bishop Valentin Pozaić S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarija Bistrica

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Zagreb.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,840
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 May 2017