Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Šaško

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

Titular Bishop of Rotaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1966 BornĐivan
28 Jun 199225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
11 Feb 200841.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
11 Feb 200841.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
29 Mar 200841.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria

MicroData Summary for Ivan Šaško:
Bishop Ivan Šaško (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Zagreb.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2008
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013