Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Želimir Puljić

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1947 BornKamena
24 Mar 197427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
7 Dec 198942.7AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
14 Jan 199042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
15 Mar 201063.0AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Želimir Puljić:
Archbishop Želimir Puljić (born ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,855
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013