Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mate Uzinić

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1967 Born
27 Jun 199325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
24 Jan 201143.3AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
19 Mar 201143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mate Uzinić (VIAF: 305647122)
Bishop Mate Uzinić (born ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubrava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast