Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marin Barišic

Archbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1947 Born
14 Jul 197427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
3 Aug 199346.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
3 Aug 199346.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
17 Oct 199346.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
21 Jun 200053.2AppointedArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marin Barišic (VIAF: 61824469)
Archbishop Marin Barišic (born ) Archbishop of Split-Makarska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVidonje

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Split-Makarska.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast