Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jure Bogdan

Bishop of Croatia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1955 Born
24 Jun 197923.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Split-Makarska, Croatia
22 Jun 198024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
30 Nov 201560.0AppointedBishop of Croatia, Military
27 Feb 201660.2Ordained BishopBishop of Croatia, Military

MicroData Summary for Jure Bogdan (VIAF: 120887386)
Bishop Jure Bogdan (born ) Bishop of Croatia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonji Doci
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Co-Cathedral, Split, Archdiocese of Split-Makarska

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Croatia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 4 Jan 2016
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,849

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Jan 2019

Quantcast