Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Vidović

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Belarus

Titular Archbishop of Nona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1953 Born
28 May 198935.8Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska, Croatia
15 Sep 200451.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus
15 Sep 200451.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nona
21 Nov 200451.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nona
2011²57.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Belarus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Vidović
Archbishop Martin Vidović (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Belarus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVidonje

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Belarus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,715
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast