Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vinko Cardinal Puljic

Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Chiara a Vigna Clara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1945 BornPrijecani
29 Jun 197024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Banjaluka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
19 Nov 199045.2AppointedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
6 Jan 199145.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
26 Nov 199449.2Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199449.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Chiara a Vigna Clara

MicroData Summary for Vinko Puljic:
Vinko Cardinal Puljic (born ) Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014