Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Ćurić

Auxiliary Bishop of Šakovo-Osijek, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Tela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1964 Born
11 Mar 198924.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
29 Jun 199025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
11 Mar 201954.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Šakovo-Osijek, Croatia
11 Mar 201954.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
22 Apr 201954.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tela

MicroData Summary for Ivan Ćurić
Bishop Ivan Ćurić (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Šakovo-Osijek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlavonski Brod, Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Šakovo, Archdiocese of Šakovo-Osijek

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Šakovo-Osijek.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2019
  • od: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 12 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Apr 2019

Quantcast