Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Đuro Hranić

Archbishop of Šakovo-Osijek, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1961 Born
29 Jun 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
5 Jul 200140.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
5 Jul 200140.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
22 Sep 200140.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaudiaba
18 Apr 201352.0AppointedArchbishop of Šakovo-Osijek, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Đuro Hranić (VIAF: 162522618)
Archbishop Đuro Hranić (born ) Archbishop of Šakovo-Osijek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinkovci
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Šakovo, Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Šakovo-Osijek.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,052
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Apr 2019

Quantcast