Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Iby

Bishop Emeritus of Eisenstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1935 BornRaiding
29 Jun 195924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Burgenland, Austria
28 Dec 199257.9AppointedBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
24 Jan 199358.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
9 Jul 201075.5RetiredBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Paul Iby:
Bishop Paul Iby (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Eisenstadt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eisenstadt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,996
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013