Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pero Sudar

Auxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

Titular Bishop of Selia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1951 BornVrhbosna
29 Jun 197726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
28 May 199341.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
28 May 199341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
7 Jan 199442.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia

MicroData Summary for Pero Sudar:
Bishop Pero Sudar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,245
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,200
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013