Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ćiril Kos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1919Born
9 Jul 194424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
6 Feb 197454.2AppointedBishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
17 Mar 197454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
6 Feb 199777.2RetiredBishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
6 Jul 200383.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ćiril Kos (VIAF: 305521037)
Bishop Ćiril Kos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRibic Brijeg
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Djakovo, Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast