Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Akšamović

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1875Born
9 Jul 189924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
22 Apr 192044.9AppointedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
29 Jun 192045.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
28 Mar 194266.8ResignedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
28 Mar 194266.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
7 Oct 195984.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Anton Akšamović
Bishop Anton Akšamović (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarčin

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1920, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018