Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivan Rafael Rodić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1870BornNurkovac
29 Oct 192454.4AppointedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
7 Dec 192454.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
28 Nov 193666.5ResignedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
28 Nov 193666.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
10 May 195483.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Rafael Rodić:
Archbishop Ivan Rafael Rodić O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013