Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vjekoslav Huzjak

Bishop of Bjelovar-Križevci, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1960 Born
29 Jun 198626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
5 Jul 199737.3IncardinatedPriest of Varaždin, Croatia
5 Dec 200949.7AppointedBishop of Bjelovar-Križevci, Croatia
20 Mar 201050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bjelovar-Križevci, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vjekoslav Huzjak (VIAF: 305593334)
Bishop Vjekoslav Huzjak (born ) Bishop of Bjelovar-Križevci

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJalžabet

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bjelovar-Križevci.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast