Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojz Turk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1909BornPrecna
8 Jul 193424.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 198070.3AppointedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
20 Apr 198070.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
16 Dec 198677.1RetiredArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
19 Apr 199585.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary for Alojz Turk:
Archbishop Alojz Turk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013