Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marko Jozinović

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1920BornDevetine
29 Jun 194424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
27 Jun 197757.2AppointedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
23 Oct 197757.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
19 Apr 199070.1ResignedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
11 Aug 199474.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Marko Jozinović:
Archbishop Marko Jozinović (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Sep 2014