Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nándor Bosák

Bishop Emeritus of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1939 BornTaksonyíalva
13 Jun 196323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
31 May 199353.4AppointedBishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary
15 Jun 199353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary
21 Sep 201575.7RetiredBishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Nándor Bosák:
Bishop Nándor Bosák (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,113
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015