Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father László Felföldi

Bishop-Elect of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1961 Born
21 Jun 198625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
31 May 199332.3IncardinatedPriest of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary
18 Nov 202059.7AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
6 Jan 202159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Felföldi
Father László Felföldi (born ) Bishop-Elect of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeszteréd
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pécs, Diocese of Pécs

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Pécs.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Nov 2020

Quantcast