Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vince Kovács

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Vác

Titular Bishop of Zaraď


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1886BornGalgamacsa
16 Nov 191024.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 194053.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
20 Jul 194053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaraď
22 Sep 194054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaraď
23 Sep 195973.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vác, Hungary
1969¹82.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Vác, Hungary
15 Mar 197487.6DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vince Kovács:
Bishop Vince Kovács (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Vác

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013