Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Winkler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Dadima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1905Born
26 Oct 193025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Szombathely, Hungary
15 Sep 195953.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary
15 Sep 195953.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dadima
28 Oct 196459.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dadima
30 Jan 198175.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Winkler
Bishop József Winkler (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagyszentmihaly
Ordained BishopBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast