Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gyula Glattfelder

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1874Born
15 Oct 189622.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 191137.0AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
14 May 191137.1Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
24 Sep 194268.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Csanád, Hungary
24 Sep 194268.5AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
30 Aug 194369.4DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Gyula Glattfelder
Archbishop Gyula Glattfelder (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018