Catholic-Hierarchy DC

János Cardinal Simor

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1813Born
24 Oct 183623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
28 Oct 183623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
20 Feb 185743.4SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
19 Mar 185743.5ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
29 Jun 185743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
20 Jan 186753.4SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Feb 186753.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Dec 187360.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 187460.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
23 Jan 189177.4DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Simor (VIAF: 13212425)
János Cardinal Simor (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzékesfehérvár, Diocese of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Death PlaceEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 317, and Page 528
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017