Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István (Štefan) Lipovniczky

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1814Born
24 Oct 183622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
21 Aug 183723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
27 Nov 186854.2SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
20 Apr 186954.6ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
23 May 186954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
12 Aug 188570.9DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for István (Štefan) Lipovniczky (VIAF: 232143162)
Bishop István (Štefan) Lipovniczky (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranyosmarót, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 359
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,649
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017