Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Junák

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Titular Bishop of Olba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1809BornGyöngyös
14 Sep 183223.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Sep 183223.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 187566.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
23 Nov 187566.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
6 Feb 187666.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
3 Sep 187970.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for István Junák
Bishop István Junák (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016