Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Jószef Peitler

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1808Born
10 Apr 183123.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 185950.8SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
15 Apr 185951.0ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
19 Jun 185951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
24 Jul 188577.3DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Jószef Peitler (VIAF: 266105956)
Bishop Antal Jószef Peitler (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlacePécs, Diocese of Pécs
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 578
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017