Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Neszveda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1811Born
29 Sep 183524.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vác, Hungary
30 Sep 183524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
27 Mar 188473.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
27 Mar 188473.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
11 May 188473.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
20 Apr 189079.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Neszveda
Bishop István Neszveda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlacePüspök-Hatvan, Diocese of Vác
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • c4: CB, 28 Jul 2016
  • d: CB, 29 Jul 2016
  • c23: CB, 31 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,055
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018