Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Durguth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Sion


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1790Born
11 Nov 181222.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186575.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
25 Sep 186575.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
1 Nov 186575.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
10 Nov 187282.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Durguth
Bishop József Durguth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÜrmény, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 521
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Nov 2015
  • c34: ATh, 20 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,647
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,865, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast