Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Ranolder

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1806Born
8 Oct 182822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 May 182923.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 184943.4SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
7 Jan 185043.6ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
12 May 185043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
12 Sep 187569.3DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Ranolder (VIAF: 40472635)
Bishop János Ranolder (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlacePecs

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 588
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017