Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Girk

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1793³BornBaja
17 Sep 181522.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Oct 181522.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 183845.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
17 Sep 183845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
25 Nov 183845.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
4 Sep 185259.3SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
10 Mar 185359.8ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Nov 186875.5DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Girk (VIAF: 81737533)
Bishop György Girk (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 474
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016